AR HB1401 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-13 - Notification that HB1401 is now Act 266
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Regarding Public Assistance; And To Amend The Duration Of Cash Assistance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regarding Public Assistance; And To Amend The Duration Of Cash Assistance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-09 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - Third Reading (Y: 81 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-13HouseNotification that HB1401 is now Act 266
2023-03-09HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2023-03-09HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2023-03-09HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2023-03-09SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2023-03-09SenateRead the third time and passed.
2023-03-08SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2023-02-22SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2023-02-22SenateReceived from the House.
2023-02-22HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2023-02-21HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2023-02-13HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2023-02-13HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback