AR HB1400 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Notification that HB1400 is now Act 740
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Arkansas Medical Marijuana Amendment Of 2016; And To Prohibit The Smoking Of Marijuana In Any Location In Arkansas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Arkansas Medical Marijuana Amendment Of 2016; And To Prohibit The Smoking Of Marijuana In Any Location In Arkansas.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-23 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-29HouseNotification that HB1400 is now Act 740
2017-03-27HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2017-03-23HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2017-03-23HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2017-03-23SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2017-03-23SenateRead the third time and passed.
2017-03-22SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2017-03-20SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor
2017-03-20SenateReceived from the House.
2017-03-17HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2017-03-15HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2017-03-14HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-03-14HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2017-03-14HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2017-01-31HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES
2017-01-30HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback