AR HB1399 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
Pending: Senate Public Health, Welfare And Labor Committee
Hearing: Mar 20 @ 10:00 am in Room 272
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Create The Prohibition Of Public Funding Of Human Cloning And Destructive Embryo Research Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Create The Prohibition Of Public Funding Of Human Cloning And Destructive Embryo Research Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 71 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-02-19SenateReceived from the House.
2019-02-19HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-02-18HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-18HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-02-18HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-02-14HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-02-06HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-02-06HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback