AR HB1393 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-17 - Notification that HB1393 is now Act 290
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-17 - Notification that HB1393 is now Act 290
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Create Mental Health Awareness Week In Public Schools.
Title
To Create Mental Health Awareness Week In Public Schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - Third Reading (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - Third Reading (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-17 | House | Notification that HB1393 is now Act 290 |
2023-03-14 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2023-03-13 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2023-03-13 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2023-02-27 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2023-02-23 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2023-02-09 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2023-02-09 | House | Filed |