AR HB1391 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Notification that HB1391 is now Act 1015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Notification that HB1391 is now Act 1015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning Consumer Protection Of Seniors From Predatory Practices; And Safeguarding Against Financial Exploitation Of Retirees For Arkansans.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning Consumer Protection Of Seniors From Predatory Practices; And Safeguarding Against Financial Exploitation Of Retirees For Arkansans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - Third Reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - Third Reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | House | Notification that HB1391 is now Act 1015 |
2021-04-23 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-04-22 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-04-22 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-04-15 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-14 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-14 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-04-12 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2 |
2021-03-31 | House | In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2021-03-31 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-31 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-02-03 | House | In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the first time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE JOURNAL; ENGROSSED AND ENROLLED BILLS |
2021-02-03 | House | Filed |