AR HB1390 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died in House at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died in House at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Establish Arkansas As A Second Amendment Sanctuary State; Concerning The Rights Of A Person Who Possesses A Firearm; And To Require Ratification To Recognize Federal Firearms Laws.
Title
To Establish Arkansas As A Second Amendment Sanctuary State; Concerning The Rights Of A Person Who Possesses A Firearm; And To Require Ratification To Recognize Federal Firearms Laws.
Sponsors
Rep. Johnny Rye [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 11 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 11 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-15 | House | Died in House at Sine Die Adjournment |
2021-04-28 | House | Returned from the Governor as requested |
2021-04-28 | House | Request to return from Governor |
2021-04-22 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-04-21 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-04-21 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-04-05 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-01 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-02-03 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-02-03 | House | Filed |