AR HB1389 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Notification that HB1389 is now Act 311
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend Statutes Concerning Theft Of Property; And To Clarify That A Backup Deep Cycle Battery Is Utility Property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend Statutes Concerning Theft Of Property; And To Clarify That A Backup Deep Cycle Battery Is Utility Property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05HouseNotification that HB1389 is now Act 311
2019-02-28HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-02-28HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-02-28HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2019-02-28SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2019-02-28SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-02-27SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-02-21SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-02-21SenateReceived from the House.
2019-02-21HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-02-19HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-02-06HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-02-06HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback