AR HB1389 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-06 - Notification that HB1389 is now Act 299
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-06 - Notification that HB1389 is now Act 299
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning The Minimum Bid Amount Under Contracts For State Aid Roads.
Title
Concerning The Minimum Bid Amount Under Contracts For State Aid Roads.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-05 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 58 N: 22 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 58 N: 22 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-06 | House | Notification that HB1389 is now Act 299 |
2013-03-05 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-03-05 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-03-05 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology and Legislative Affairs |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-02-25 | House | CLINCHER MOTION ADOPTED |
2013-02-25 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-02-22 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-02-18 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2013-02-18 | House | Filed |