AR HB1388 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-01 - Notification that HB1388 is now Act 290
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Ensure Registered Voters Are United States Citizens; To Create A Process For Transfer Of Information From The Judiciary To The Voter Registration Officials; And To Amend Amendment 51 Of The Arkansas Constitution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Ensure Registered Voters Are United States Citizens; To Create A Process For Transfer Of Information From The Judiciary To The Voter Registration Officials; And To Amend Amendment 51 Of The Arkansas Constitution.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 73 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - Motion to suspend fiscal impact rule passes (Y: 69 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-01HouseNotification that HB1388 is now Act 290
2019-02-28HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-02-27HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-02-27HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2019-02-27SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2019-02-27SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-02-26SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-02-21SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2019-02-21SenateReceived from the House.
2019-02-21HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-02-21HouseMotion to suspend fiscal impact rule passes
2019-02-18HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-18HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-02-18HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-02-13HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2019-02-06HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2019-02-05HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback