AR HB1386 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

To Be Known As The "arkansas Second Amendment Liberties Safeguards Act"; To Require State Agencies And Public Officers To Disregard Unconstitutional Overreaches Of Power; And To Protect The Constitutional Rights Of Arkansans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Be Known As The "arkansas Second Amendment Liberties Safeguards Act"; To Require State Agencies And Public Officers To Disregard Unconstitutional Overreaches Of Power; And To Protect The Constitutional Rights Of Arkansans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-15 - House - Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 19 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-20SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2021-04-15SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-04-15SenateReceived from the House.
2021-04-15HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-04-14HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-04-14HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2021-04-14HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2021-04-13HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2
2021-03-17HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-03-17HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2021-03-17HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2021-02-03HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2021-02-02HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback