AR HB1386 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Notification that HB1386 is now Act 1079
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Notification that HB1386 is now Act 1079
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Require The Filing Of Final Agency Rules With The Arkansas State Library; And To Amend Provisions Of The Administrative Procedure Act.
Title
To Require The Filing Of Final Agency Rules With The Arkansas State Library; And To Amend Provisions Of The Administrative Procedure Act.
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Lemons [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | House | Notification that HB1386 is now Act 1079 |
2017-04-03 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2017-04-03 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2017-04-03 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2017-03-31 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 |
2017-03-30 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2017-03-30 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-03-22 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-20 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-03-15 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-15 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-01-30 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2017-01-30 | House | Filed |