AR HB1386 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-10)
Status: Passed on March 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-01 - Notification that HB1386 is now Act 253
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-10)
Status: Passed on March 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-01 - Notification that HB1386 is now Act 253
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Allow Certain Nonresidential Business Consumers To Opt Out Of Utility-sponsored Energy Conservation Programs And Measures And Direct Their Own Energy Conservation Programs And Measures; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Allow Certain Nonresidential Business Consumers To Opt Out Of Utility-sponsored Energy Conservation Programs And Measures And Direct Their Own Energy Conservation Programs And Measures; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-26 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-22 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-22 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-01 | House | Notification that HB1386 is now Act 253 |
2013-02-27 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-02-26 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-02-26 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-02-22 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2013-02-22 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-02-20 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-02-15 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on ENERGY - JOINT |
2013-02-15 | House | Filed |