AR HB1384 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Notification that HB1384 is now Act 365
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Notification that HB1384 is now Act 365
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Clarify When The Division Of Youth Services May Release Information About A Juvenile To The General Public.
Title
To Clarify When The Division Of Youth Services May Release Information About A Juvenile To The General Public.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-04 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Notification that HB1384 is now Act 365 |
2019-03-06 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2019-03-05 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2019-03-05 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2019-03-04 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-02-21 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-02-19 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-02-05 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed |