AR HB1382 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-29 - WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-29 - WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning Notice To Alleged Offenders Of The Right To Request An Administrative Review Under The Child Maltreatment Act.
Title
Concerning Notice To Alleged Offenders Of The Right To Request An Administrative Review Under The Child Maltreatment Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | House | WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR |
2021-02-04 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-02-04 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-02-04 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-02-03 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-02-02 | House | Filed |