AR HB1381 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Notification that HB1381 is now Act 538
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Law Concerning Arkansas's Contribution To The National Statuary Hall Collection In The United States Capitol.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Law Concerning Arkansas's Contribution To The National Statuary Hall Collection In The United States Capitol.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-06 - House - Senate amendment # 2 read and concurred in. (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - Third Reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-11HouseNotification that HB1381 is now Act 538
2023-04-07HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2023-04-06HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2023-04-06HouseSenate amendment # 2 read and concurred in.
2023-04-06HouseSenate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
2023-04-06HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 & 2
2023-04-05HouseRe-referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2023-04-05HouseReturned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 & 2
2023-04-05SenateReturned to the House as passed, as amended # 1 & 2
2023-04-05SenateRead the third time and passed.
2023-04-04SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2023-04-04SenateAmendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2023-04-04SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2023-04-04SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2
2023-04-03SenateRe-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2023-04-03SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2023-04-03SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2023-04-03SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2023-04-03SenateRules suspended.
2023-02-21SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2023-02-16SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2023-02-16SenateReceived from the House.
2023-02-16HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2023-02-15HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2023-02-08HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2023-02-08HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?id=hb1381&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1381.pdf
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1381%2FHB1381040320231449.pdf
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1381%2FHB1381040420231515.pdf
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Acts/FTPDocument?path=%2FACTS%2F2023R%2FPublic%2F&file=538.pdf&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Amendmenthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Home/FTPDocument?path=%2FAMEND%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1381-S1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Home/FTPDocument?path=%2FAMEND%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1381-S2.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1381&rcs=261&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1381&rcs=944&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1381&rcs=1136&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1381&rcs=1137&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R

Bill Comments

feedback