AR HB1378 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-02 - Notification that HB1378 is now Act 304
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-02 - Notification that HB1378 is now Act 304
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Allow Certain Types Of Corporations To Conduct Sampling Activities; And To Allow For The Donation Of Alcoholic Beverages To A Charitable Event For A Sampling Activity.
Title
An Act To Allow Certain Types Of Corporations To Conduct Sampling Activities; And To Allow For The Donation Of Alcoholic Beverages To A Charitable Event For A Sampling Activity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-22 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 71 N: 6 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 71 N: 6 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-02 | House | Notification that HB1378 is now Act 304 |
2017-02-23 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2017-02-22 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2017-02-22 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-02-06 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-02-01 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-01-30 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES |
2017-01-26 | House | Filed |