AR HB1375 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-27 - Notification that HB1375 is now Act 148
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The Department Of Corrections - Division Of Community Correction Reappropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The Department Of Corrections - Division Of Community Correction Reappropriation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-23 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - Third Reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-27HouseNotification that HB1375 is now Act 148
2023-02-23HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2023-02-23HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2023-02-23HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2023-02-23SenateReturned to the House as Passed.
2023-02-23SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2023-02-23SenateRead the third time and passed.
2023-02-22SenateRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2023-02-22SenateReceived from the House.
2023-02-22HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2023-02-22HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2023-02-22HouseConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2023-02-22HouseRULES SUSPENDED
2023-02-21HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2023-02-08HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
2023-02-08HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback