AR HB1375 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Notification that HB1375 is now Act 310
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Law Concerning The Financial Operations Of A County.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Law Concerning The Financial Operations Of A County.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05HouseNotification that HB1375 is now Act 310
2019-02-28HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-02-28HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-02-28HouseSenate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
2019-02-27HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
2019-02-19HouseRe-referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-02-19HouseReturned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2019-02-19SenateReturned To the House as passed as amended.
2019-02-19SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-02-18SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-18SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-02-18SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-02-14SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2019-02-11SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-02-11SenateReceived from the House.
2019-02-11HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-02-06HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-02-04HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-02-04HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback