AR HB1371 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-08 - Notification that HB1371 is now Act 1239
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-08 - Notification that HB1371 is now Act 1239
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning Parole Revocation Hearings, Location Of Parole Revocation Hearings, And Custody Of A Parolee During A Parole Revocation Proceeding.
Title
Concerning Parole Revocation Hearings, Location Of Parole Revocation Hearings, And Custody Of A Parolee During A Parole Revocation Proceeding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-08 | House | Notification that HB1371 is now Act 1239 |
2015-04-02 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2015-04-02 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2015-04-02 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2015-04-01 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 |
2015-03-31 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2015-03-31 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2015-03-27 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-03-27 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-27 | House | Amendment No. 1 and 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-27 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2015-03-26 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 and 2. |
2015-02-12 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2015-02-12 | House | Filed |