AR HB1369 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-10 - Notification that HB1369 is now Act 504
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Require Public Entities To Create A Policy Concerning The Authorized Use Of Technology Resources And A Cyber Security Policy; And To Amend The Duties Of The State Cyber Security Office.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Require Public Entities To Create A Policy Concerning The Authorized Use Of Technology Resources And A Cyber Security Policy; And To Amend The Duties Of The State Cyber Security Office.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - Third Reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-10HouseNotification that HB1369 is now Act 504
2023-04-05HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2023-04-04HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2023-04-04HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2023-04-04SenateReturned to the House as Passed.
2023-04-04SenateRead the third time and passed.
2023-03-30SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2023-03-15SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE
2023-03-15SenateReceived from the House.
2023-03-15SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE
2023-03-15SenateReceived from the House.
2023-03-15HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2023-03-14HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2023-03-14HouseAmendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2023-03-14HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2023-03-13HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 3
2023-02-27HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2023-02-27HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2023-02-27HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2023-02-07HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on ADVANCED COMMUNICATIONS AND INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY - HOUSE
2023-02-07HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?id=hb1369&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1369.pdf
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1369%2FHB1369022720231136.pdf
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1369%2FHB1369031420230930.pdf
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Acts/FTPDocument?path=%2FACTS%2F2023R%2FPublic%2F&file=504.pdf&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Amendmenthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Home/FTPDocument?path=%2FAMEND%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1369-H1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Home/FTPDocument?path=%2FAMEND%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1369-H2.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Home/FTPDocument?path=%2FAMEND%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1369-H3.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1369&rcs=533&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1369&rcs=823&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R

Bill Comments

feedback