AR HB1369 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died in House at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died in House at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Provide For The Creation Of A Regulatory Division Of The Department Of Finance And Administration, The Appointment Of A Regulatory Administrator, And The Assignment Of Enforcement Agents.
Title
To Provide For The Creation Of A Regulatory Division Of The Department Of Finance And Administration, The Appointment Of A Regulatory Administrator, And The Assignment Of Enforcement Agents.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-15 | House | Died in House at Sine Die Adjournment |
2021-03-22 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-22 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-22 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-17 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-03-16 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-16 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-16 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-02-02 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2021-02-01 | House | Filed |