AR HB1369 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-28 - Notification that HB1369 is now Act 670
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Arkansas Medical Marijuana Amendment Of 2016 Regarding The Taxation And Distribution Of Proceeds; And To Create Various Funds For The Implementation Of The Arkansas Medical Marijuana Amendment Of 2016.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Arkansas Medical Marijuana Amendment Of 2016 Regarding The Taxation And Distribution Of Proceeds; And To Create Various Funds For The Implementation Of The Arkansas Medical Marijuana Amendment Of 2016.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-21 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-28HouseNotification that HB1369 is now Act 670
2017-03-22HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2017-03-21HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2017-03-21HouseSenate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
2017-03-20HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
2017-03-16HouseRe-referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES
2017-03-16HouseReturned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2017-03-16SenateReturned To the House as passed as amended.
2017-03-16SenateRead the third time and passed.
2017-03-15SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2017-03-06SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation
2017-03-06SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-03-06SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2017-03-06SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2017-02-13SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation
2017-02-13SenateReceived from the House.
2017-02-10HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2017-02-08HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2017-02-02HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-02-02HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2017-02-02HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2017-01-26HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES
2017-01-26HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback