AR HB1368 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-10 - CLINCHER MOTION ADOPTED
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Law Concerning The Dates For Certain Special Elections; And To Promote Voter Turnout.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Law Concerning The Dates For Certain Special Elections; And To Promote Voter Turnout.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-10 - House - Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 46 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-10 - House - Motion to reconsider HB 1368 passes (Y: 47 N: 39 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-04 - House - Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 49 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-10HouseCLINCHER MOTION ADOPTED
2021-02-10HouseRead the third time and failed.
2021-02-10HouseMotion to reconsider HB 1368 passes
2021-02-08HouseRep. Barker, S served notice that they will within the time prescribed move to reconsider the vote by which HB1368 Failed to Pass - 02/08/2021 1:19:10 PM
2021-02-04HouseRead the third time and failed.
2021-02-03HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-02-01HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2021-02-01HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback