AR HB1365 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-13 - Notification that HB1365 is now Act 264
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-13 - Notification that HB1365 is now Act 264
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning Records Maintained By Scrap Metal Recyclers; And To Create Offenses For Theft Of A Catalytic Converter And Unauthorized Possession Of A Catalytic Converter.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning Records Maintained By Scrap Metal Recyclers; And To Create Offenses For Theft Of A Catalytic Converter And Unauthorized Possession Of A Catalytic Converter.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-08 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - Third Reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - Third Reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-13 | House | Notification that HB1365 is now Act 264 |
2023-03-08 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2023-03-08 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2023-03-08 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2023-03-01 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2023-02-28 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2023-02-27 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2023-02-27 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2023-02-27 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2023-02-14 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2023-02-14 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2023-02-14 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2023-02-13 | House | Re-referred to reassign to transfer to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2023-02-07 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE |
2023-02-07 | House | Filed |