AR HB1364 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Notification that HB1364 is now Act 527
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Require A Candidate To Use His Or Her Surname On A Ballot In An Election; And To Amend The Law Concerning Ballots.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Require A Candidate To Use His Or Her Surname On A Ballot In An Election; And To Amend The Law Concerning Ballots.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-18 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20HouseNotification that HB1364 is now Act 527
2019-03-19HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-03-18HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-03-18HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2019-03-18SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2019-03-18SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-14SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-03-07SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2019-03-07SenateReceived from the House.
2019-03-07HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-06HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-02-13HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-13HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-02-13HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-02-11HouseRe-referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2019-02-06HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-02-04HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2019-02-04HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback