AR HB1357 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Notification that HB1357 is now Act 583
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Continue Care For The Protection Of Cancer Survivors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Continue Care For The Protection Of Cancer Survivors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - Third Reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-06HouseNotification that HB1357 is now Act 583
2021-04-05HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2021-04-01HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2021-04-01HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2021-04-01SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2021-04-01SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-03-30SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2021-03-16SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
2021-03-16SenateReceived from the House.
2021-03-16HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-03-15HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-02-01HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
2021-02-01HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback