AR HB1355 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Repeal The Financing Of Certain Postsecondary Out-of-state Medical Education Programs; And To Create The Medical Student Loan Repayment And Tuition Reimbursement Program Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Repeal The Financing Of Certain Postsecondary Out-of-state Medical Education Programs; And To Create The Medical Student Loan Repayment And Tuition Reimbursement Program Act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04HouseRecommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-04-04HouseWITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR
2019-02-25HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-25HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-02-25HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-02-01HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-01-31HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback