AR HB1347 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 32-8)
Status: Passed on March 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Notification that HB1347 is now Act 244
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Create A Financial Aid Appeals Process And Committee For The Division Of Higher Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Create A Financial Aid Appeals Process And Committee For The Division Of Higher Education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-07 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - Third Reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-10HouseNotification that HB1347 is now Act 244
2023-03-08HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2023-03-07HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2023-03-07HouseSenate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
2023-03-06HouseReturned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2023-03-06SenateReturned To the House as passed as amended.
2023-03-06SenateRead the third time and passed.
2023-03-01SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2023-02-28SenateRe-referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
2023-02-28SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2023-02-28SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2023-02-28SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2023-02-28SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2023-02-22SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
2023-02-22SenateReceived from the House.
2023-02-22HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2023-02-21HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2023-02-02HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2023-02-02HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?id=hb1347&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1347.pdf
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1347%2FHB1347022820231017.pdf
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Acts/FTPDocument?path=%2FACTS%2F2023R%2FPublic%2F&file=244.pdf&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Amendmenthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Home/FTPDocument?path=%2FAMEND%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1347-S1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1347&rcs=304&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1347&rcs=399&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1347&rcs=429&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R

Bill Comments

feedback