AR HB1344 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Failed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Failed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Create The Working Families Opportunity Act.
Title
To Create The Working Families Opportunity Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | House | Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2015-03-20 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-20 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-20 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2015-03-13 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-13 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-13 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2015-02-10 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE |
2015-02-10 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2015/2015R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HB1344 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2015/2015R/Bills/HB1344.pdf |