AR HB1343 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Died in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

To Allow The Contents Of A Teacher Preparation Program To Include Certain Content That Pertains To Evidence-based Trauma-informed Classroom Instruction Within Its Curriculum.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Allow The Contents Of A Teacher Preparation Program To Include Certain Content That Pertains To Evidence-based Trauma-informed Classroom Instruction Within Its Curriculum.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-01HouseDied in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment
2023-02-20HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2023-02-20HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2023-02-20HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2023-02-06HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2023-02-06HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2023-02-06HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2023-02-02HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2023-02-02HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback