AR HB1342 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE
Pending: Senate Revenue & Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

To Increase The Amount Below Which Sales And Use Tax Is Not Due On The Purchase Of A Used Motor Vehicle; And To Eliminate The Sales And Use Tax Exemption For Certain Motor Vehicles, Trailers, And Semitrailers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Increase The Amount Below Which Sales And Use Tax Is Not Due On The Purchase Of A Used Motor Vehicle; And To Eliminate The Sales And Use Tax Exemption For Certain Motor Vehicles, Trailers, And Semitrailers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-20 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 84 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE
2019-03-20SenateReceived from the House.
2019-03-20HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-19HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-02-14HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-14HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-02-14HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-02-07HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-07HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-02-07HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-01-31HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
2019-01-31HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback