AR HB1340 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-01 - Notification that HB1340 is now Act 190
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-01 - Notification that HB1340 is now Act 190
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning Member Contributions, Service Credit, Correction Of Errors, And Termination Of Membership Under The Arkansas Teacher Retirement System; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning Member Contributions, Service Credit, Correction Of Errors, And Termination Of Membership Under The Arkansas Teacher Retirement System; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Evans [R] | Sen. Lance Eads [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - Third Reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - Third Reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | House | Notification that HB1340 is now Act 190 |
2021-02-25 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-02-24 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-02-24 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-02-23 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-02-23 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-02-22 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-01-28 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT |
2021-01-28 | House | Filed |