AR HB1337 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Classify A Building Or Space Used For A Public Early Childhood Education Program Or For A Safe Room For Students As An Academic Facility Under The Arkansas Public School Academic Facilities Funding Act.
Title
To Classify A Building Or Space Used For A Public Early Childhood Education Program Or For A Safe Room For Students As An Academic Facility Under The Arkansas Public School Academic Facilities Funding Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-20 - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 15 NV: 32 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Senate | Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2023-02-20 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2023-02-16 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2023-02-01 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2023-02-01 | House | Filed |