AR HB1335 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Notification that HB1335 is now Act 595
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Notification that HB1335 is now Act 595
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning Credited Service And Voluntary Retirement Under The Arkansas Teacher Retirement System; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning Credited Service And Voluntary Retirement Under The Arkansas Teacher Retirement System; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. John Maddox [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Notification that HB1335 is now Act 595 |
2019-03-27 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2019-03-26 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2019-03-26 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-03-19 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2019-03-19 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-03-18 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-03-14 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-03-14 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2019-03-14 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2019-03-06 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-03-06 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2019-01-31 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT |
2019-01-31 | House | Filed |