AR HB1332 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-06 - Notification that HB1332 is now Act 209
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Authorize A Housing Stipend For Arkansas Department Of Transportation Interns.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Authorize A Housing Stipend For Arkansas Department Of Transportation Interns.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-28 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 23 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 38 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-06HouseNotification that HB1332 is now Act 209
2023-03-02HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2023-03-02HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2023-03-02HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2023-03-02SenateOrdered immediately returned to the House.
2023-02-28SenateMotion to Hold HB1332 in the Senate for up to three days. Motion carried.
2023-02-28SenateRead the third time and passed.
2023-02-27SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2023-02-14SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE
2023-02-14SenateReceived from the House.
2023-02-14HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2023-02-14HouseMotion by Rep. Vaught for reconsideration of HB 1332 passed
2023-02-13HouseRep. Vaught, D served notice that they will within the time prescribed move to reconsider the vote by which HB1332 Failed to Pass - 02/13/2023 2:17:08 PM
2023-02-13HouseRead the third time and failed.
2023-02-09HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2023-02-08HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2023-02-08HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2023-02-08HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2023-01-31HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
2023-01-31HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?id=hb1332&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1332.pdf
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1332%2FHB1332020820230918.pdf
Texthttps://arkleg.state.ar.us/Acts/FTPDocument?path=%2FACTS%2F2023R%2FPublic%2F&file=209.pdf&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Amendmenthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Home/FTPDocument?path=%2FAMEND%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1332-H1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1332&rcs=194&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1332&rcs=219&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1332&rcs=347&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R

Bill Comments

feedback