AR HB1328 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-10 - Notification that HB1328 is now Act 314
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-10 - Notification that HB1328 is now Act 314
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning Terms Of Office Of County Elected Officers To Coincide With The Arkansas Constitution.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning Terms Of Office Of County Elected Officers To Coincide With The Arkansas Constitution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - Third Reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - Third Reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-10 | House | Notification that HB1328 is now Act 314 |
2021-03-08 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-03-08 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-03-08 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-02-23 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-02-22 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-01-28 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-01-28 | House | Filed |