AR HB1328 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-23 - House Notification that HB1328 is now Act 117
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-23 - House Notification that HB1328 is now Act 117
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act For The Arkansas Commission On Law Enforcement Standards And Training Reappropriation.
Title
An Act For The Arkansas Commission On Law Enforcement Standards And Training Reappropriation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-21 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-23 | House Notification that HB1328 is now Act 117 | |
2011-02-22 | House Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. | |
2011-02-21 | House TO BE ENROLLED | |
2011-02-21 | House Returned From the Senate as passed. | |
2011-02-21 | Senate Returned to the House as Passed. | |
2011-02-21 | Senate EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED | |
2011-02-21 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2011-02-21 | Senate Rules suspended. | |
2011-02-21 | Senate Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass. | |
2011-02-17 | Senate Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. | |
2011-02-17 | Senate Received from the House. | |
2011-02-17 | House EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED | |
2011-02-17 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-02-17 | House Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass. | |
2011-02-17 | House RULES SUSPENDED | |
2011-02-16 | House Returned by the Committee Do Pass | |
2011-02-07 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on Joint Budget Committee | |
2011-02-07 | House Filed |