AR HB1325 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-01 - Notification that HB1325 is now Act 237
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-01 - Notification that HB1325 is now Act 237
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Process For Appointment, Certification, And Regulation Of Court Interpreters.
Title
To Amend The Process For Appointment, Certification, And Regulation Of Court Interpreters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-28 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-01 | House | Notification that HB1325 is now Act 237 |
2013-02-28 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-02-28 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-02-28 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-02-21 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-02-19 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-02-13 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-02-13 | House | Filed |