AR HB1324 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-18 - Notification that HB1324 is now Act 176
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Law Concerning The Definition Of A "tow Business".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Law Concerning The Definition Of A "tow Business".

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 81 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 57 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-18HouseNotification that HB1324 is now Act 176
2019-02-14HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-02-14HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-02-14HouseSenate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
2019-02-13HouseReturned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2019-02-13SenateReturned To the House as passed as amended.
2019-02-13SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-02-12SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-12SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-02-12SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-02-11SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2019-02-07SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE
2019-02-07SenateReceived from the House.
2019-02-07HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-02-05HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-01-31HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
2019-01-31HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback