AR HB1322 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Notification that HB1322 is now Act 497
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend Certain Definitions Used In The Motor Vehicle Administration, Certificate Of Title, And Antitheft Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend Certain Definitions Used In The Motor Vehicle Administration, Certificate Of Title, And Antitheft Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18HouseNotification that HB1322 is now Act 497
2019-03-14HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-03-13HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-03-13HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2019-03-13SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2019-03-13SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-11SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-03-06SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE
2019-03-06SenateReceived from the House.
2019-03-06HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-05HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-04HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-04HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-04HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-02-25HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-25HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-02-25HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-01-31HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
2019-01-31HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback