AR HB1312 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Notification that HB1312 is now Act 578
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Notification that HB1312 is now Act 578
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Establish The Transportation Benefit Manager Act; To Regulate Contracts Of Certain Ambulance Providers; And To Regulate Claims And Prior Authorization Procedures For Certain Ambulance Services.
Title
To Establish The Transportation Benefit Manager Act; To Regulate Contracts Of Certain Ambulance Providers; And To Regulate Claims And Prior Authorization Procedures For Certain Ambulance Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - Third Reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - Third Reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-11 | House | Notification that HB1312 is now Act 578 |
2023-04-06 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2023-04-06 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2023-04-06 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Returned to the House as Passed. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2023-04-04 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2023-04-04 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2023-04-04 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2023-04-04 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2023-04-03 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2 |
2023-03-30 | House | In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE |
2023-03-30 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2023-03-30 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2023-03-30 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2023-01-30 | House | In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the first time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE JOURNAL; ENGROSSED AND ENROLLED BILLS |
2023-01-27 | House | Filed |