AR HB1307 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 86-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-30 - Notification that HB1307 is now Act 411
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning The Regulation Of Environmental, Social Justice, Or Governance Scores; And To Authorize The Treasurer Of State To Divest Certain Investments Or Obligations Due To Certain Factors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning The Regulation Of Environmental, Social Justice, Or Governance Scores; And To Authorize The Treasurer Of State To Divest Certain Investments Or Obligations Due To Certain Factors.

Sponsors

Rep. Jeff Wardlaw [R]Sen. Ricky Hill [R]Rep. Brandon Achor [R]Rep. Wade Andrews [R]
Rep. Sonia Eubanks Barker [R]Rep. Howard Beaty [R]Rep. Mary Bentley [R]Rep. Mark Berry [R]
Rep. Stan Berry [R]Rep. Harlan Breaux [R]Rep. Joey Carr [R]Rep. Frances Cavenaugh [R]
Rep. Bruce Cozart [R]Rep. Cindy Crawford [R]Rep. Carol Dalby [R]Rep. Matt Duffield [R]
Rep. Les Eaves [R]Rep. Jon Eubanks [R]Rep. Brian Evans [R]Rep. Charlene Fite [R]
Rep. Lanny Fite [R]Rep. Jack Fortner [R]Rep. Jimmie Gazaway [R]Rep. Justin Gonzales [R]
Rep. Zack Gramlich [R]Rep. RJ Hawk [R]Rep. DeAnna Hodges [R]Rep. Grant Hodges [R]
Rep. Mike Holcomb [R]Rep. Steve Hollowell [R]Rep. Lane Jean [R]Rep. Lee Johnson [R]
Rep. Jack Ladyman [R]Rep. Wayne Long [R]Rep. Robin Lundstrum [R]Rep. John Maddox [R]
Rep. Julie Mayberry [R]Rep. Mindy McAlindon [R]Rep. Rick McClure [R]Rep. Richard McGrew [R]
Rep. Brit McKenzie [R]Rep. Ron Mcnair [R]Rep. Stephen Meeks [R]Rep. Jon Milligan [R]
Rep. Jeremiah Moore [R]Rep. Stetson Painter [R]Rep. Shad Pearce [R]Rep. Chad Puryear [R]
Rep. Marcus Richmond [R]Rep. Johnny Rye [R]Rep. Bart Schulz [R]Rep. Matthew Shepherd [R]
Rep. Trey Steimel [R]Rep. Dwight Tosh [R]Rep. Kendon Underwood [R]Rep. Steve Unger [R]
Rep. Deann Vaught [R]Rep. Steven Walker [R]Rep. Les Warren [R]Rep. Danny Watson [R]
Rep. Carlton Wing [R]Rep. Jeremy Wooldridge [R]Rep. Jim Wooten [R]Sen. Blake Johnson [R]
Sen. Bart Hester [R]Sen. Missy Irvin [R]Sen. Scott Flippo [R]Sen. Ben Gilmore [R]
Sen. Jim Dotson [R]Sen. Justin Boyd [R]Rep. Jill Bryant [R]Sen. Ronald Caldwell [R]
Sen. Steve Crowell [R]Sen. Breanne Davis [R]Sen. Tyler Dees [R]Sen. Kim Hammer [R]
Sen. Mark Johnson [R]Sen. Matt McKee [R]Sen. John Payton [R]Sen. Clint Penzo [R]
Sen. Jim Petty [R]Sen. Terry Rice [R]Sen. Matt Stone [R]Sen. Gary Stubblefield [R]
Sen. Dan Sullivan [R]Sen. David Wallace [R]

Roll Calls

2023-03-27 - House - Senate amendment # 3 read and concurred in. (Y: 70 N: 18 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 67 N: 19 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - Failed to concur in Senate Amendment No. 3 (Y: 50 N: 33 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-03-27 - House - Failed to concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 (Y: 50 N: 30 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 12 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-30HouseNotification that HB1307 is now Act 411
2023-03-28HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2023-03-27HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2023-03-27HouseSenate amendment # 3 read and concurred in.
2023-03-27HouseSenate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
2023-03-27HouseMotion by Rep. K Moore to reconsider Senate Amendment 1 & 3 passed
2023-03-27HouseFailed to concur in Senate Amendment No. 3
2023-03-27HouseFailed to concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
2023-03-15HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 & 3
2023-03-13HouseRe-referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2023-03-13HouseReturned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 & 3
2023-03-13SenateReturned To the House as passed as amended.
2023-03-13SenateRead the third time and passed.
2023-03-13SenateMotion to Expunge the vote by which HB1307 passed. Motion Carried.
2023-03-13SenateRead the third time and passed.
2023-03-09SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2023-03-09SenateAmendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2023-03-09SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2023-03-08SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 3
2023-03-01SenateRe-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2023-03-01SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2023-03-01SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2023-03-01SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2023-03-01SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2023-02-16SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2023-02-16SenateReceived from the House.
2023-02-16HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2023-02-15HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2023-02-14HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2023-02-14HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2023-02-14HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2023-02-08HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2023-02-08HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2023-02-08HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2023-01-26HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2023-01-26HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?id=hb1307&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Texthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1307.pdf
Texthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1307%2FHB1307020820230939.pdf
Texthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1307%2FHB1307021420231028.pdf
Texthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1307%2FHB1307030120230958.pdf
Texthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1307%2FHB1307030920231155.pdf
Texthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Acts/FTPDocument?path=%2FACTS%2F2023R%2FPublic%2F&file=411.pdf&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Amendmenthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FAMEND%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1307-H1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FAMEND%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1307-H2.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FAMEND%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1307-S1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FAMEND%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1307-S2.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FAMEND%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHB1307-S3.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1307&rcs=260&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1307&rcs=469&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1307&rcs=470&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1307&rcs=613&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1307&rcs=614&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1307&rcs=638&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1307&rcs=639&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R

Bill Comments

feedback