AR HB1306 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Law Concerning The Number Of Voting Sites In A City Of The First Class.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Law Concerning The Number Of Voting Sites In A City Of The First Class.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 57 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-03-07SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-03-07SenateReceived from the House.
2019-03-07HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-06HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-02-27HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-27HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-02-27HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-02-04HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-04HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-02-04HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-01-30HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-01-30HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback