AR HB1305 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-21 - Notification that HB1305 is now Act 243
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-21 - Notification that HB1305 is now Act 243
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Allow Members Of The Arkansas Teacher Retirement System To Designate One Or More Residual Beneficiaries; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Allow Members Of The Arkansas Teacher Retirement System To Designate One Or More Residual Beneficiaries; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. John Maddox [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-20 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | House | Notification that HB1305 is now Act 243 |
2017-02-21 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2017-02-20 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2017-02-20 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2017-02-20 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-02-14 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2017-02-14 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-02-13 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-02-08 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT |
2017-02-06 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-01-25 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT |
2017-01-25 | House | Filed |