AR HB1305 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-27 - Notification that HB1305 is now Act 283
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-27 - Notification that HB1305 is now Act 283
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act For The Department Of Parks And Tourism Outdoor Recreation Grants Program Supplemental Appropriation.
Title
An Act For The Department Of Parks And Tourism Outdoor Recreation Grants Program Supplemental Appropriation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-23 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-27 | House | Notification that HB1305 is now Act 283 |
2015-02-24 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2015-02-24 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2015-02-24 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Returned to the House as Passed. |
2015-02-23 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2015-02-12 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2015-02-12 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-02-12 | House | Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass. |
2015-02-12 | House | RULES SUSPENDED |
2015-02-11 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-02-09 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE |
2015-02-09 | House | Filed |