AR HB1302 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Notification that HB1302 is now Act 537
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Notification that HB1302 is now Act 537
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Offer And Ensure Coverage Of Traumatic Event Licensed Counseling For Public Safety Employees; And To Require A Study Of Availability For Peer Support Access For Volunteer Firefighters.
Title
To Offer And Ensure Coverage Of Traumatic Event Licensed Counseling For Public Safety Employees; And To Require A Study Of Availability For Peer Support Access For Volunteer Firefighters.
Sponsors
Rep. Carlton Wing [R] | Sen. Clarke Tucker [D] | Rep. Andrew Collins [D] | Rep. Lee Johnson [R] |
Rep. Jamie Scott [D] | Rep. Deann Vaught [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - House - Third Reading (Y: 82 N: 9 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - House - Third Reading (Y: 82 N: 9 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-11 | House | Notification that HB1302 is now Act 537 |
2023-04-07 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2023-04-06 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2023-04-06 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2023-04-06 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 |
2023-04-05 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2023-04-05 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed, as amended # 1 |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2023-04-03 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2023-03-30 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2023-03-30 | House | Amendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2023-03-30 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2023-03-29 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 3 |
2023-03-06 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2023-03-06 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2023-03-06 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2023-02-20 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2023-02-20 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2023-02-20 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2023-01-26 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2023-01-26 | House | Filed |