AR HB1295 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-13)
Status: Passed on March 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-01 - Notification that HB1295 is now Act 234
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-13)
Status: Passed on March 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-01 - Notification that HB1295 is now Act 234
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend Provisions Of The Arkansas Academic Challenge Scholarship Program, Part 2, Concerning Scholarship Awards From Net Proceeds Of The Lottery; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Amend Provisions Of The Arkansas Academic Challenge Scholarship Program, Part 2, Concerning Scholarship Awards From Net Proceeds Of The Lottery; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-25 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 69 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 69 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-01 | House | Notification that HB1295 is now Act 234 |
2013-02-26 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-02-25 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-02-25 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-02-18 | House | CLINCHER MOTION ADOPTED |
2013-02-18 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2013-02-18 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-02-14 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-02-14 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-02-14 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-02-13 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2013-02-11 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES |
2013-02-11 | House | Filed |