AR HB1294 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-18 - Notification that HB1294 is now Act 1334
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-18 - Notification that HB1294 is now Act 1334
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Preserve The Continuity Of Education For Students Who Attend Nonresident Schools Under The Arkansas Public School Choice Act Of 1989; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Preserve The Continuity Of Education For Students Who Attend Nonresident Schools Under The Arkansas Public School Choice Act Of 1989; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim Hammer [R] | Sen. Eddie Cheatham [D] | Rep. Ann Clemmer [R] | Rep. Charles Collins [R] |
Sen. Jeremy Hutchinson [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-16 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - Senate - Read third time and failed to pass. (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - Senate - Read third time and failed to pass. (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-18 | House | Notification that HB1294 is now Act 1334 |
2013-04-16 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-04-16 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-04-16 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2013-04-11 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 |
2013-04-08 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-04-08 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | EXPUNGED |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Read third time and failed to pass. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-02-21 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2013-02-21 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-02-19 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-02-11 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-02-11 | House | Filed |