AR HB1284 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Laws Concerning The Carrying Of A Concealed Handgun In A Church Or Other Place Of Worship; To Extend Statutory Charitable Immunity To A Church Or Other Place Of Worship; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Amend The Laws Concerning The Carrying Of A Concealed Handgun In A Church Or Other Place Of Worship; To Extend Statutory Charitable Immunity To A Church Or Other Place Of Worship; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-16 - House - Emergency Clause failed of adoption. (Y: 49 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 52 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 52 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-04-16 | House | Emergency Clause failed of adoption. |
2013-04-16 | House | CLINCHER MOTION ADOPTED |
2013-04-16 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-04-16 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-16 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-16 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-04-11 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2 |
2013-04-04 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-04 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-04 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-02-08 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-02-08 | House | Filed |