AR HB1280 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Permit An Executive Session Under The Freedom Of Information Act Of 1967 To Consider Certain Economic Development Projects; And To Permit A Governing Body's Attorney To Attend Certain Executive Sessions.
Title
To Permit An Executive Session Under The Freedom Of Information Act Of 1967 To Consider Certain Economic Development Projects; And To Permit A Governing Body's Attorney To Attend Certain Executive Sessions.
Sponsors
Rep. Delia Haak [R] | Sen. Lance Eads [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-05 - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 22 NV: 24 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-15 | Senate | Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-04-05 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-03-31 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-03-30 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-30 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-30 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-09 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-09 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-09 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-01-26 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-01-26 | House | Filed |